Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02936
Date Filed2021-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted nine FOIA requests to NIH for records concerning a variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-081COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8851266) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons NIH, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-293RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/15/2021. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/15/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH served on 11/16/2021. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-105NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-156Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, with proposed order by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-15MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/17/22. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/15/21. (DJS) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/17/2022. (tb) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar