Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWEINBERGER et al v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02926
Date Filed2021-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffSHARON WEINBERGER
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
Case DescriptionSharon Weinberger, the D.C. Bureau Chief for Yahoo News, and the James Madison Project, submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Postal Service, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning iCop, a program for surveilling social media overseen by the U.S. Postal Inspection Service. Weinberger and the James Madison Project also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Weinberger and the James Madison Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-07-141COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9380115.), filed by SHARON WEINBERGER, THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons ODNI, # 6 Summons USAG, # 7 Summons USAMD, # 8 Summons USPS)(Moss, Bradley) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-142MOTION Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCvR 102.2(a) (ex parte) by SHARON WEINBERGER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-14Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-153QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by The James Madison Project, Sharon Weinberger was filed incorrectly. Summons for Office of the Director of National Intelligence is incomplete. No address included. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. Please file corrected summons using the event "Notice (Other)". (ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-154NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. The James Madison Project, Sharon Weinberger or counsel for The James Madison Project, Sharon Weinberger are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/29/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-155Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/15/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-166Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-08-278ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service.(Robinson, John) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-309NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R Saslaw on behalf of All Defendants (Saslaw, Alexandra) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3011MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-30Case Reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3012MOTION to Transfer Case by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Saslaw, Alexandra) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-0213ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Robinson terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/1/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-1314RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by The James Madison Project, Sharon Weinberger. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-1715AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Answer Identifying Amendments)(Saslaw, Alexandra) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-2116NOTICE by The James Madison Project, Sharon Weinberger of Relevant Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order)(Moss, Bradley) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-2717REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Postal Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Saslaw, Alexandra) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-11-0118ORDER granting 12 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/1/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/9/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0919Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-01760. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar