Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGhinis v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOcala
Case Number5:2021cv00554
Date Filed2021-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John Antoon II
PlaintiffGilbert G Ghinis
Case DescriptionGilbert Ghinis submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning his Alien File. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Ghinis that it found no records. Ghinis filed an administrative appeal and the agency agreed to conduct another search. This time the agency located an Alien File for Ghinis and disclosed the records. However, the records were from another Alien File assigned to Ghinis, not the one he was looking for. Ghinis then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18910735) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons USCIS, # 3 Proposed Summons Attorney General, # 4 Proposed Summons Secretary of DHS, # 5 Proposed Summons USCIS Director, # 6 Proposed Summons USAMDFL)(Devore, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-102NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-554-JA-PRL. (MLJ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-103INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/10/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-154CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Gilbert G Ghinis. (Devore, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-165SUMMONS issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Ur. M. Jaddou, Director United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security. (LAB) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar