Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR RENEWING AMERICA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02987
Date Filed2021-11-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR RENEWING AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Center for Renewing America submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning the Abolitionist Teaching Network, an organization allegedly involved in promoting the teaching of critical race theory. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CRA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8860197) filed by CENTER FOR RENEWING AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:FOIA Request 7-27-21, # 2 Exhibit B:20 Day Notification, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons US Dept of Education, # 5 Summons US Atty General, # 6 Summons US Dept of Justice)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR RENEWING AMERICA (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/12/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2021. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 11/15/2021 (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/16/2021. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar