Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCARTER v. U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02967
Date Filed2021-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffDARRYL C. CARTER
Case DescriptionDarryl Carter submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Patti McLauchlin's role in surveilling Carter on behalf of the FBI. Carter also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Carter's request for expedited processing. Carter filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. After the agency failed to respond, Carter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantKILOLO KIJAKAZI
DefendantPATTI MCLAUCHLIN
DefendantGEOFFREY M. HEDDEN
DefendantDOES 1-50
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-091COMPLAINT against DOES 1-50, GEOFFREY M. HEDDEN, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, PATTI MCLAUCHLIN, U.S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 200994) with Jury Demand filed by DARRYL C. CARTER. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eg) Modified on 11/12/2021 to add receipt number (eg). (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DARRYL C. CARTER. Case related to (eg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DARRYL C. CARTER (eg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-104MOTION for CM/ECF Password by DARRYL C. CARTER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(eg) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-12-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 4 Motion for CM/ECF Password, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall be assigned filing privileges via CM/ECF for this case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 3, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar