Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2021cv03037
Date Filed2021-11-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's budget and several grazing permits. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-111COMPLAINT against The United States Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8172110)Attorney Andreia Elizabeth Marcuccio added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Marcuccio, Andreia) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-112Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-113SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-124ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/12/2021. Consent Form due by 1/5/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-155Utility Resetting Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, pursuant to ECF 4 . Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-296SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Bureau of Land Management served on 11/13/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Marcuccio, Andreia) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar