Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, et al.
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2021cv01646
Date Filed2021-11-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael H. Simon
PlaintiffWestern Resources Legal Center
Case DescriptionThe Western Resources Legal Center submitted FOIA requests to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the National Marine Fisheries Service for records concerning the agencies' policies on granting fee waivers. Although FOIAOnline did not appear to be working for a few days, the agency finally acknowledged receipt of the request. The agencies also granted WRLC's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, WRLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-111Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8303780 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Justesen, Tate) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-112Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, 1 . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-113Proposed Summons NMFS Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-114Proposed Summons NOAA Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-115Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-156Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/15/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (kgc) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-157Summons Issued Electronically as to National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar