Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOBURN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02991
Date Filed2021-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffGORDON J. COBURN
Case DescriptionGordon Coburn, the former president of Cognizant Technology Solutions who was facing charges of violating the Foreign Corrupt Practices Act, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning communications between DOJ and SEC pertaining to the Cognizant charges. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied the requests under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Coburn filed administrative of the denials. Both agencies denied his appeal. Coburn then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-121COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8861487) filed by GORDON J COBURN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Walther, Harold) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-12Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-163STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 11/16/21. (lcrl) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-12-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/22/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/22/2021. (Walther, Harold) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/22/2021; U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 11/19/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/24/2021. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document) (zjf) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-03NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to hwalther@jonesday.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their filing (zjf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar