Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATION CASINOS, LLC v. NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03010
Date Filed2021-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffSTATION CASINOS, LLC
Case DescriptionStation Casinos, LLC submitted seven FOIA requests to the National Labor Relations Board for records concerning a variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and responded to some of them in part. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Station Casinos filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
DefendantNATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD 1015 Half Street, S.E. 4th Floor Washington, D.C. 20570
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-121COMPLAINT against NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8863696) filed by Station Casinos, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Farrington, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-15Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-152SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-163STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 16, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-294LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STATION CASINOS, LLC (Farrington, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-025NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Ann Wagner on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD (Wagner, Marissa) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-026NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Ferraro Meiners on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD (Meiners, Denise) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-037Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Wagner, Marissa) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar