Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBlack Alliance for Just Immigration et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2021cv06239
Date Filed2021-11-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William F. Kuntz, II
PlaintiffBlack Alliance for Just Immigration
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
Case DescriptionBlack Alliance for Just Immigration and the American Immigration Council submitted eight FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's use of force, solitary confinement, access to medical treatment and other conditions that impact Black immigrants in ICE detention. The requesters also sought a fee waiver for each request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, BAJI and AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-101COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15017556 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Black Alliance for Just Immigration, American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A (Adams Cty Corr. Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 2 Ex. B (Jackson Parish Corr. Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 3 Ex. C (LaSalle ICE Processing Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 4 Ex. D (Pine Prairie ICE Processing Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 5 Ex. E (Prairieland Detention Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 6 Ex. F (T. Don Hutto Res. Ctr. FOIA Req.), # 7 Ex. G (West Texas Detention Facility FOIA Req.), # 8 Ex. H (Winn Corr. Ctr. FOIA Req.)) (Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-102Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by American Immigration Council, Black Alliance for Just Immigration (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons (ICE), # 2 Proposed Summons (DHS)) (Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-103Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Immigration Council, Black Alliance for Just Immigration (Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-10Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-104Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 DHS summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-105In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-106This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/10/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-107First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15019509. by Black Alliance for Just Immigration. (Gurmu, Tsion) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-188NOTICE by American Immigration Council, Black Alliance for Just Immigration Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Students (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A (Belsito Appearance Forms), # 2 Ex. B (Bloch Appearance Forms), # 3 Ex. C (Brocki Appearance Forms), # 4 Ex. D (Sorensen Appearance Forms)) (Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/18/2021)
2021-11-239ORDER re 8 Notice of Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Students, filed by Black Alliance for Just Immigration, American Immigration Council. The application has been granted. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 11/23/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar