Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. Food and Drug Administration
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2021cv01026
Date Filed2021-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lee Yeakel
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionThe Informed Consent Action Network submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning unredacted copies of three tables that appeared in the document entitled CMC Review Memorandum dated August 21, 2021. ICAN also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFood and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-121COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15436741), filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B.1, # 3 Exhibit B.2, # 4 Exhibit B.3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-122REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 11/15/2021) (cj). (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-12Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-12If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (cj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-153Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Gabrielle G. Palmer and Ursula Smith re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-154Summons Issued as to Food and Drug Administration. (cj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-165MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabrielle G. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15447228) by on behalf of Informed Consent Action Network. (Palmer, Gabrielle) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-196MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Siri on behalf of Ursula M. Smith ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15461652) by on behalf of Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-227ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gabrielle G. Palmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-238SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informed Consent Action Network. Food and Drug Administration served on 11/18/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-239ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ursula M. Smith. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar