Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03121
Date Filed2021-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning home confinement placements under the CARES Act. The ACLU also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The ACLU's request for expedited processing for two requests was granted. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-291COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8891917) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate under LCvR 26.1, # 3 Exhibit A - 09/24/2021 FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit B - Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit C - 09/30/2021 FOIA Request #1, # 6 Exhibit D - 09/30/2021 FOIA request #2, # 7 Exhibit E - 10/08/2021 FOIA request, # 8 Summons to BOP, # 9 Summons to DOJ, # 10 Summons to Attorney General, # 11 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (adh, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-29Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-293SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-294MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma Andersson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8892641. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emma Andersson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-295STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 29, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiffs' 4 Motion for Admission of Attorney Emma Andersson Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 29, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/31/2021. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/03/2021. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-078RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 12/3/2021 (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-079RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/6/2021 (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-1010NOTICE of Appearance by Emma A. Andersson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Andersson, Emma) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-2811NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2022-01-0312ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-10MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiffs' FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 10, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar