Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHEATLAND v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03126
Date Filed2021-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffRAND WHEATLAND
Case DescriptionRand Wheatland submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning transcripts, minutes, and recordings of the meetings of the NIH COVID-19 Guidelines Panel from 2020 and 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request entirely. Wheatland filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wheatland filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8893421) filed by RAND WHEATLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-30Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-11-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-033STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 3, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-244NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/24/2021)
2022-01-055ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-10MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before 2/10/2022. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request[s] and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request[s] can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 10, 2022. (lccjn2) Modified on 1/10/2022 to correct date(zcal). (Entered: 01/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar