Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03130
Date Filed2021-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request t the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the number of current commissioned law enforcement rangers and special agents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-301COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8896477) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for BLM, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-11-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2022-01-054NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-065ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by January 20, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/6/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/20/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-206Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 9, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/20/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar