Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTATE OF GEORGIA et al v. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03138
Date Filed2021-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffSTATE OF GEORGIA
PlaintiffBRAD RAFFENSPERGER Georgia Secretary of State, in his official capacity
Case DescriptionThe State of Georgia submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's decision to sue Georgia over the constitutionality of its recent changes to how elections are conducted in Georgia. Georgia also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Georgia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-011COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8897892) filed by BRAD RAFFENSPERGER, STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B: FOIA Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit C: JMD FOIA Acknowledgment, # 4 Exhibit D: OIP FOIA Acknowledgment, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons DOJ, # 7 Summons DOJ-M Garland, # 8 Summons US Atty)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-012NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-01Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-024STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/2/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/7/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/6/2022. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/7/2021 (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/07/2021. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2022-01-068NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-069ANSWER to Complaint by US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-06MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before February 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/6/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar