Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOCUMENTED v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03142
Date Filed2021-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDOCUMENTED
Case DescriptionDocumented, a non-profit news organization covering New York City's immigrants, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning all Secretary's Decision Papers issued or published from January 2017 to the present. Documented also asked the agency to review specific type of software. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Documented filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8898760) filed by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to USAO DC, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons to DHS)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-02Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2022-01-073NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-074ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-075STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer and file a joint report with a proposed schedule within 15 days of this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/7/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar