Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMilagro Guatemala et al v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv09366
Date Filed2021-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andre Birotte Jr
PlaintiffMilagro Guatemala
PlaintiffNoe Corzo
PlaintiffAdriana Garcia
PlaintiffLuis Lopez
PlaintiffCarlos Curaca
Case DescriptionMilagro Guatemala, Noe Corzo, Adriana Garcia, Luis Lopez Grijalva, and Carlos Curaca submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning their immigration files. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, all five individuals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
DefendantEOIR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-021COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32418261 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Curaca, Adriana Garcia, Noe Corzo, Milagro Guatemala, Luis Lopez. (Attorney Megan A Brewer added to party Noe Corzo(pty:pla), Attorney Megan A Brewer added to party Carlos Curaca(pty:pla), Attorney Megan A Brewer added to party Adriana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Megan A Brewer added to party Milagro Guatemala(pty:pla), Attorney Megan A Brewer added to party Luis Lopez(pty:pla))(Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-022NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-023Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Corzo, Carlos Curaca, Adriana Garcia, Milagro Guatemala, Luis Lopez. (Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-024CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Noe Corzo, Carlos Curaca, Adriana Garcia, Milagro Guatemala, Luis Lopez. (Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-065NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 CV11-C Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-06660 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review. (et) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-067STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiffs Noe Corzo, Carlos Curaca, Adriana Garcia, Milagro Guatemala, Luis Lopez. (Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-138PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Carlos Curaca, Adriana Garcia, Noe Corzo, Milagro Guatemala, Luis Lopez, upon Plaintiff All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit certified mail tracking)(Brewer, Megan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-139REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-2210STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Executive Office for Immigration Review answer now due 2/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review.(Attorney Paul B La Scala added to party Executive Office for Immigration Review(pty:dft))(La Scala, Paul) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2022-01-1811NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-09366 AB(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar