Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Florida v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Pierce
Case Number2:2021cv14462
Date Filed2021-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jose E. Martinez
PlaintiffState of Florida
Case DescriptionThe State of Florida submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for several records. Florida also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Florida's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Florida filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-031COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and to Compel Production of Documents against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15218459, filed by State of Florida. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit CBP FOIA Confirmation, # 3 Exhibit CBP Fee Waiver Email, # 4 Exhibit CBP Expedited Processing Email, # 5 Exhibit CBP Extension Email, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summon(s))(Percival, James) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-032Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-033Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security (mc) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2022-01-044NOTICE by State of Florida of Service (Attachments: # 1 A. Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 B. USPS Tracking) (Percival, James) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-045SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by State of Florida. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/6/2021, response/answer due 2/4/2022; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 12/6/2021, response/answer due 2/4/2022; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/6/2021, response/answer due 2/4/2022; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/6/2021, response/answer due 2/4/2022. See DE# 4 for image. (ebz) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-046Clerks Notice to Filer re 4 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 5 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (ebz) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-06Attorney Ashley Brooke Moody representing State of Florida (Plaintiff) terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Ashley Moody. Action taken per request from the AG office as Ashley Moody is the actual FL Attorney General. (scn) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-207NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Kuntal Cholera added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-208ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar