Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03179
Date Filed2021-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Small Business Administration for records concerning allegations that payments made under the Paycheck Protection Program were being forgiven to industries favored by the Biden administration at a faster rather than others. EPA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-061COMPLAINT against SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8908073) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-06Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-083NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/9/2021) (rj). Modified on 12/9/2021 to flatten pdf(rj). (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2022-01-114NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
2022-01-135ANSWER to Complaint by SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 2/28/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/14/22. (DJS) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2022. (tb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar