Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03201
Date Filed2021-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning crop seeds treated with any of four listed chemicals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-071COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8912441) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Van Saun, Amy) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Van Saun, Amy) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-134STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 13, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/13/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 12/15/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit of Receipts Verifying Service)(Van Saun, Amy) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2022-01-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, it is ORDERED the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint by February 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 18, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar