Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Health And Human Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv10420
Date Filed2021-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis A. Kaplan
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffMark Walker
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the Indian Health Services for records used to track persons eligible for the Purchased/Referred Care Program. The New York Times also clarified that it did not want personally identifying information. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health And Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-071COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health And Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-25430741)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-07ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents United States Department of Health And Human Services added. Party added pursuant to 1 Complaint.Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker. Related document: 1 Complaint..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-073REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-074RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-08CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-085ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health And Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-136ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/9/21) (yv) Modified on 12/28/2021 (yv). (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-137ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, and for report and recommendation on dispositive motions, if any, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. Parties and counsel are cautioned: Once a discovery schedule has been issued, all discovery must be initiated in time to be concluded by the close of discovery set by the Court. Court conferences and hearings may be conducted by teleconference, videoconference, or in person. Teleconferences are held on the Court's AT&T line. If a teleconference is scheduled, the parties are directed to call (888) 557-8511 and enter the access code 7746387 a few minutes before the scheduled time and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/13/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-148CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Health And Human Services served on 12/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Mark Walker..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2022-01-079ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar