Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBoundy v. United States Patent and Trademark Office(USPTO)
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2021cv01366
Date Filed2021-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles
PlaintiffDavid Boundy
Case DescriptionDavid Boundy submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office for records concerning the signatory requirements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and had discussions with Boundy of the scope of his request but after the agency failed to respond, Boundy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-071Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8140817.), filed by DAVID BOUNDY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Letter Appearance (Form ao458), # 3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Neifeld, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/8/2021 Removed incorrectly filed PDF fillable form) (nneb, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/8/2021 Removed incorrectly filed PDF fillable form) (nneb, ). Modified on 12/8/2021 (nneb, ). (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-07Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (nneb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Notice of Correction re 1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified that document [1-1 and 1-2] are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (nneb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-082NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Neifeld on behalf of DAVID BOUNDY (Neifeld, Richard) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-083NOTICE by DAVID BOUNDY re 1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Neifeld, Richard) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-084Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by DAVID BOUNDY. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Proposed Summons, US Atty, # 2 Appendix Proposed Summons, Atty General)(Neifeld, Richard) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-095Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (USPTO), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2022-01-046AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General of the United States served on 1/4/2022, filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 (dest). Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-047AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia served on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (dest). Modified on 1/13/2022 (nneb). (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-048AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Office of the General Counsel, United States Patent and Trademark Office on 1/4/2022, filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-129Filed In Error and Removed (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1210Filed in Error and Removed (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1211Filed in Error and Removed (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1312SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Boundy. United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) served on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Neifeld, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-1813NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Michaela Wesnousky on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) (Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1814Certificate Reporting Service by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) served on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1815NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Michaela Wesnousky on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) (Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1816Certificate Reporting Service by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). (Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1817Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wesnousky, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar