Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03207
Date Filed2021-12-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmericans for Prosperity Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Trace Commission for records concerning the decision to replace the 2015 Section 5 policy statement concerning unfair methods of competition. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed it in unusual circumstance processing queue. After hearing nothing further from the agency, APF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8913352) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons FTC, # 6 Summons USAG, # 7 Summons USAO-DC)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-093STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 12/9/2021. (lcsw) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-094SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/9/2022. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-136NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2021. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/31/2021)
2021-12-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION served on 12/22/2021 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/31/2021)
2022-01-049NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-0410Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond, for good cause shown. Defendant's response to the Complaint is due on February 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/5/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the Complaint due by 2/9/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar