Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Public Radio, Inc. et al v. United States Central Command
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv10511
Date Filed2021-12-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Crotty
PlaintiffNational Public Radio, Inc.
PlaintiffHansi Lo Wang
Case DescriptionNational Public Radio submitted two FOIA request to U.S. Central Command for records concerning the attempt to kill Abu Bakr al-Baghdadi. NPR also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Central Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-081COMPLAINT against United States Central Command. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25442433)Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Hansi Lo Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H).(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-082CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-083RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-084REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Central Command, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Hansi Lo Wang..(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-085FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Hansi Lo Wang..(Balin, Robert) Modified on 12/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-086FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of NY, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Hansi Lo Wang..(Balin, Robert) Modified on 12/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-09CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-09Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-09Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-097ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Central Command..(jgo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-09***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert D. Balin to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text and the PDF 'To' section is not a party of record;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2022-01-038FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 11 AFFIDAVIT) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. §552 et seq. with Exhibits A-H, Civil Cover Sheet, National Public Radio, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses, and Individual Practices of Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. served on United States Central Command on 12/14/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) Modified on 1/4/2022 (db). (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-039FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 12 AFFIDAVIT) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. §552 et seq. with Exhibits A-H, Civil Cover Sheet, National Public Radio, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses, and Individual Practices of Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. served on United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice on 12/14/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) Modified on 1/4/2022 (db). (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-0310AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. §552 et seq. with Exhibits A-H, Civil Cover Sheet, National Public Radio, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses, and Individual Practices of Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. served on U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York on 12/13/2021. Service was accepted by Ostrick Gordon. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-0411AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. §552 et seq. with Exhibits A-H, Civil Cover Sheet, National Public Radio, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses, and Individual Practices of Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. served on United States Central Command on 12/13/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-0412AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. §552 et seq. with Exhibits A-H, Civil Cover Sheet, National Public Radio, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses, and Individual Practices of Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. served on United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice on 12/13/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Public Radio, Inc...(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-1213NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of United States Central Command..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1214ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Central Command..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1315ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty) (Text Only Order) (dgo) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar