Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEmpower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research v. U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2021cv01370
Date Filed2021-12-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr
PlaintiffEmpower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research
Case DescriptionEmpower Oversight Whistleblowers and Research submitted six FOIA request for records concerning communications between William Hinman and any personnel from Simpson Thatcher. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EOWR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-081Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8143434.), filed by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-082Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint (to SEC) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-083Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint (to US Atty, EDVA) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-084Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint (to US AG) by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-085Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empower Oversight Whistleblowers & Research. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-106Summons Issued as to U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2022-01-077Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-108ORDER granting 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before Friday, February 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 01/10/2022. (choy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar