Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03228
Date Filed2021-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM
Case DescriptionNational Veterans Legal Services Program submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the first page of each Board of Veterans Appeals decision from October 2019 through September 2020. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NVLSP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8916426) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stichman, Barton) . (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bart_stichman@nvlsp.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-133ERRATA by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re 1 Complaint filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Complaint)(Stichman, Barton) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-134STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/13/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-165SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znm) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2022-01-106NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-107Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for extension, Dkt. 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before February 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar