Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv10534
Date Filed2021-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffLee Levine
PlaintiffStephen Wermiel
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporters Lee Levine and Stephen Wermiel submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the surveillance of New York Times reporters during the COINTELPRO investigation. The New York Times also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request, claiming it did not adequately describe records. The New York Times filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-091COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25447324)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Stephen Wermiel, Lee Levine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D).(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-093RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-094REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lee Levine, The New York Times Company, Stephen Wermiel..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-095NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Schulz on behalf of Lee Levine, The New York Times Company, Stephen Wermiel..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-10Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-106ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation..(pc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-137NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 0534. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/13/2021) (tg) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-228AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Stephen Wermiel; Lee Levine..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2022-01-139NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-1810ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar