Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. National Park Service
DistrictDistrict of Utah
CityCentral
Case Number2:2021cv00719
Date Filed2021-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tena Campbell
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionWestern Watershed Project submitted nine FOIA requests to the National Parks Service for records concerning annual updates for the agency's range program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency disclosed some records but withheld others. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Park Service
DefendantUnited States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-05-201COMPLAINT against National Park Service ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2218065.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Brooks, Talasi) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-203MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Persell. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2218140.)Talasi B Brooks appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 6/10/2021 (Brooks, Talasi) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-214DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Persell for Western Watersheds Project Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-05-215Summons Issued as to National Park Service. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-06-026CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Watersheds Project re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Issued (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail and Postage Receipts)(Persell, John) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-06-257MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Robert Burke Firpo appearing for Defendant National Park Service. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Firpo, Robert) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-07-168RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Western Watersheds Project. Replies due by 7/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nancy Linscott, # 2 Exhibit Email from A. Yamato to J. Ratner 1-15-21, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan B. Ratner, # 4 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to GCNRA NPS-2020-00199, # 5 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to GCNRA DOI-NPS-2021-001449, # 6 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to DNM NPS-2019-00394, # 7 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to BCGNP DOI-NPS-2021-000622, # 8 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to CRNP NPS-2019-00057, # 9 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to CRNP NPS-2019-00750, # 10 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to CRNP NPS-2019-00408, # 11 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to CRNP NPS-2020-00835, # 12 Exhibit WWP FOIA Request to CRNP NPS-2019-00409)(Persell, John) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-289REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by National Park Service.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/29/2021.(Firpo, Robert) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-08-0610Joint MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendant's Request to Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Robert Burke Firpo appearing for Defendant National Park Service. Responses due by 8/27/2021 (Firpo, Robert) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-1111MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The Joint Motion to Expedite Consideration of Defendants Request to Stay all Deadlines (Dkt. 10 ) is GRANTED; The Request for a stay all deadlines, particularly to file an Answer, is DENIED; NPS shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-3112ANSWER to 1 Complaint by National Park Service.(Firpo, Robert) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-0113NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for National Park Service, Western Watersheds Project re 1 Complaint, 12 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/1/2021. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-0814AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons to National Park Service, # 2 Summons Summons to U.S. Department of Interior)(Persell, John) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-0915Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 summons)(alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-2216CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Watersheds Project re 15 Summons Issued as to USA, 14 Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail and Postage Receipts)(Persell, John) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-3017ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by National Park Service, U.S. Department of Interior.(Firpo, Robert) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-2218Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-11-02The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-12-0819MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NPSs Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 7 ) is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court shall take the steps necessary to transfer this case to theUnited States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw) [Transferred from Idaho on 12/9/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-0920Case transferred in from USDC of Idaho; Case Number 1:21-cv-00219. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC District of Utah Case number 2:21-cv-00719-TC; Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-0921NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Talasi B Brooks, for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. (nl) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-0922NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert Burke Firpo, for Defendants National Park Service and United States Department of Interior. (nl) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Talasi B. Brooks filed by John S. Persell on behalf of Western Watersheds Project (Persell, John) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar