Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITMAN v. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03163
Date Filed2021-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffAARON J. WHITMAN
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-29Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/29/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-11-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY filed by AARON J. WHITMAN. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(znmg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-11-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AARON J. WHITMAN. (znmg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-11-293PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by AARON J. WHITMAN (znmg) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2022-01-074ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $70.29 from Prison Account of Aaron J. Whitman and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/7/2022. (rj) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-13Case assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (rj) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-145STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/14/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar