Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMartinez v. Administrative Office of the United States Courts
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CitySan Antonio
Case Number5:2021cv01200
Date Filed2021-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Fred Biery
PlaintiffJose Martinez
Case DescriptionJose Martinez submitted a FOIA request to the Administrative Office of U.S. Courts for records concerning transcripts of his trial. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantAdministrative Office of the United States Courts named as Administrative Office of US Courts
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-201PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jose Martinez. (6 pages) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope)(MCO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2021: # 3 Complaint with case number added) (MCO). [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-202NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-293ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 9/29/2021. (ARC) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-184Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number TUC033565. PAID IN FULL. (SCA) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-11-095ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 11/9/2021. (ARC) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-306AMENDED COMPLAINT against Administrative Office of the United States Courts filed by Jose Martinez. (7 pages)(SCA) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-067ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must transfer the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 6 ) and this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 12/3/2021. (ARC) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/6/2021.] (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-068Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 4:21-cv-00371. (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-06Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-06If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-089Case Opening Letter by Jose Martinez. (mgr) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/8/2021) (mgr). (Entered: 12/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar