Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Department of Justice et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2021cv09613
Date Filed2021-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffAnayansi Diaz-Cortes
Case DescriptionCenter for Investigative Reporting reporter Anayansi Diaz-Cortes submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of State for records concerning the investigation of General Salvador Cienfuegos Zepeda, the former Defense Secretary of Mexico by both Mexico and the United States. The DOJ request were submitted to the Criminal Division, DEA, and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys. All three acknowledged receipt of the requests. The State Department also acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from either agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-131COMPLAINT against Department of Justice, Department of State ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16714379.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting, Anayansi Diaz-Cortes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration of D. Victoria Baranetsky, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits Part 3, # 6 Proposed Summons - Proposed Summons attached to Complaint in error (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/13/2021) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-132Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-133Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2021. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-134Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-135Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-146Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-167***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anayansi Diaz-Cortes, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2021) Modified on 12/17/2021 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-17Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed" Re: 7 Certificate of Service fil ed by Anayansi Diaz-Cortes, The Center for Investigative Reporting (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-178SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Anayansi Diaz-Cortes. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2022-01-069CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/20/2022 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-1210STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Department of Justice, Department of State. (Johns, Douglas) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar