Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHarvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2021cv12030
Date Filed2021-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denise J. Casper
PlaintiffHarvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
Case DescriptionThe Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records submitted by ICE to the Office of the Inspector General pertaining to detainees with mental health disabilities placed segregated housing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HIRCP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9095864 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Local Category Form, # 3 Exhibit)(Ardalan, Sabrineh) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-132ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-133Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-144NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Torrey on behalf of Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program (Torrey, Philip) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-155MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Amanda Azarian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9099243 by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program.(Ardalan, Sabrineh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-156MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Bitkower Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9099251 by Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program.(Ardalan, Sabrineh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-297Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Amanda Azarian ; granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Bitkower. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account . Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2022-01-058NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-079NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Azarian on behalf of Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program (Azarian, Amanda) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-0810NOTICE of Appearance by David Bitkower on behalf of Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program (Bitkower, David) (Entered: 01/08/2022)
2022-01-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fitzgerald on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1812Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 21, 2022 to Respond to the Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar