Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBonner v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv10673
Date Filed2021-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffRaymond Bonner
Case DescriptionJournalist Raymond Bonner submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning Abu Zubaydah's writings while in detention. Bonner also asked for inclusion in the new media fee category and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Bonner's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing from the agency after six months, Bonner filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied his administrative because it had not yet made an adverse decision on his request. Bonner then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Agency Record, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-141COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25465609)Document filed by Raymond Bonner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A: FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B: Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C: Administrative Appeal).(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-142CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-143NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Stich on behalf of Raymond Bonner..(Stich, Stephen) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-144STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-02166. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-145REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-15CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-15Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-15CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:21-cv-02166. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-156ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (vf) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-20CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02166-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-20NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-20Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (aea) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-01-067AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Central Intelligence Agency served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Raymond Bonner..(Stich, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar