Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv09680
Date Filed2021-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffMohamed Al Elew
Case DescriptionCenter for Investigative Reporting reporter Mohamed al Elew submitted two FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning Natural Gas STAR Program annual reports and their implementation. Elew also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted Elew's request for a fee waiver. The agency then invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DefendantEnvironmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-151COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16723054). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Mohamed Al Elew . (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration of D. Victoria Baranetsky, # 3 Exhibit A - M, # 4 Exhibit N - W, # 5 Proposed Summons)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/15/2021) Modified on 12/17/2021 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-152Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2021. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-163Certification of Interested Entities filed by Mohamed Al Elew, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Mohamed Al Elew. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2021) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-174Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-175Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-306CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
2022-01-037CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamed Al Elew, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-038CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mohamed Al Elew, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-059NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari Assistant US Attorney (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-1310CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-1411CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-1812ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 1/18/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1813CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Initial Case Management Conference has been set for March 22, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 15th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-09680-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-1914STIPULATION to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar