Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03280
Date Filed2021-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between senior officials and individuals and entities involved in supporting the attempt to overturn the presidential election results. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8931064) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DHS, # 5 Summons as to DOJ)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-20Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-224STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 22, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2022-01-035NOTICE of Appearance by Mehreen A Rasheed on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-036SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
2022-01-117AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Redline Comparison)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar