Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03292
Date Filed2021-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning animals that died in any BLM long-term holding facility from January 2020 to April 5, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-151COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8932700) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Malone, Sean) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-17Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar