Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03302
Date Filed2021-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION
Case DescriptionThe National Treasury Employees Union submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for electronic records containing a list of bargaining-unit eligible BLM employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NTEU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-171COMPLAINT National Treasury Employees Union against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8935720) filed by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Giles, Allison) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION (Giles, Allison) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2022-01-054NOTICE of Appearance by Julie M. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Julie) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-055NOTICE of Appearance by Paras N. Shah on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shah, Paras) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2022. (Giles, Allison) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2021. (Giles, Allison) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/22/2021 (Giles, Allison) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar