Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKAPLAN et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03306
Date Filed2021-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJONATHAN KAPLAN
PlaintiffJOHN NAPIER TYE
PlaintiffVALUES UNITED
doing business as WHISTLEBLOWER AID
Case DescriptionJonathan Kaplan, John Tye, and Values Added, dba Whistleblower Aid, submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the National Geospatial Intelligence Agency, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning the reprisal report pertaining to Kaplan's whistleblower activities. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Kaplan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-171COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8938353) filed by JONATHAN KAPLAN, VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID, JOHN NAPIER TYE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons)(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID (Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to schulzd@ballardspahr.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-214REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, filed by JONATHAN KAPLAN, VALUES UNITED, JOHN NAPIER TYE. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by VALUES UNITED, JOHN NAPIER TYE, JONATHAN KAPLAN.(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-295SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2022-01-036NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar