Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBIRON v. GEORGE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03307
Date Filed2021-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffLISA A. BIRON
DefendantLINDSEY GEORGE Federal Bureau of Prisons Chief of Information Management
DefendantMICHAEL CARVAJAL Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons
DefendantLINDSEY GEORGE Chief of Information Management
DefendantMICHAEL CARVAJAL Federal Bureau of Prisons Director
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-171NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004278 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by LINDSEY GEORGE, MICHAEL CARVAJAL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Superior Court Documents Compl.)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-212NOTICE to Counsel/Party re 1 Notice of Removal, (zsb) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-273Receipt on 12/27/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 004278 B. (zjf) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar