Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL v. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03314
Date Filed2021-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Council submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the efficiency and accuracy of the facial recognition technology by CBP One. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8940321) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-213SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to ecreighton@immcouncil.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. No signature on civil cover sheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & refile using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-214REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-215CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL.(Creighton, Emily) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/21/2021) (zjf). (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-216SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztth) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2022-01-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION served on 12/28/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/28/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/29/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/29/2021. (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar