Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv10888
Date Filed2021-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Shooting Incident Review Team and Shooting Incident Review Group reports completed since his 2016 request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage and the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-201COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25490690)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-202CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-203REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-204RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-21CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(gp) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-21Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (gp) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-21Case Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-215ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation..(gp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/21/2021) (gp). (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2022-01-106NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-197LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Christine S. Poscablo dated January 19, 2022 re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 01/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar