Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAU v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03329
Date Filed2021-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBYRON TAU
Case DescriptionByron Tau submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the Department of Homeland Security, and the National Archives and Records Administration for records. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Tau filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND
DefendantU.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-211COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CDCDC-8943965) filed by Byron C. Tau. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-212NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of Byron C. Tau (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-213NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of Byron C. Tau (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
2021-12-23Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-274SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)
2021-12-285STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 28, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar