Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAPM REPORTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03346
Date Filed2021-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAPM REPORTS
Case DescriptionAPM Reports submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning the investigation of the 2005 killing of civilians in Haditha, Iraq by U.S. Marines. APM Reports also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, APM Reports filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DefendantU.S. MARINE CORPS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. MARINE CORPS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8946409) filed by APM REPORTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2021-12-222NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of APM REPORTS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2021-12-23Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-273SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. MARINE CORPS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar