Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE FUND, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03358
Date Filed2021-12-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE FUND, INC.
Case DescriptionThe National Security Archive Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning 51 administrative appeals that remained unanswered. The agency acknowledged the receipt of the requests but failed to resolve them. The National Security Archive Fund then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-231COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8948253) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE FUND, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate Under LCvR 26.1, # 3 Summons)(Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE FUND, INC. (znmg) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2021-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
2021-12-303SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
2022-01-124AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE FUND, INC..(Griffin, Ryan) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar