Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWINE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03349
Date Filed2021-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffMITCHELL WINE
Case DescriptionMitchell Wine submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning a redacted email from his former supervisor at the Fish and Wildlife Service and law enforcement personnel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wine filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 201268) with Jury Demand filed by MITCHELL WINE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg) Modified on 1/7/2022 to add receipt information (zeg). (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-132MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief by MITCHELL WINE. (See Docket Entry 1 to view document). (zeg) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-23SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (zeg) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-233ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/23/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-274RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 3 Order denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief. filed by MITCHELL WINE. (zjf) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2021-12-275Emergency MOTION for Declaratory Judgment with Injunctive Relief by MITCHELL WINE. (zjf) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2021-12-286Summons (2) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (zjf) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2022-01-057NEW Request Regarding Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by MITCHELL WINE (eg) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-1111RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/4/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/4/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2022.) (zeg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-128AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR with Jury Demand filed by MITCHELL WINE.(eg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-129MOTION Injunctive Relief by MITCHELL WINE. (See Docket Entry 8 to view document). (zeg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-1310STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/13/22. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-14MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff in this case has filed two motions for emergency injunctive relief. See ECF Nos. 5 and 9. A preliminary injunction is "an extraordinary and drastic remedy" that should only be granted if the movant "carries the burden of persuasion" by "a clear showing." Mazurek v. Armstrong, 520 U.S. 968, 972 (1997) (cleaned up). The Court declines to consider multiple simultaneous requests for emergency relief. If Plaintiff wishes the Court to consider his request for emergency injunctive relief, he must file one document with all the relief he believes he is entitled to. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 65.1(c), Plaintiff's application for a preliminary injunction should be made in a document separate from his Complaint. Plaintiff is advised that the Court may order an in-person motion hearing on the emergency relief he requests. The Government's duty to respond to Plaintiff's 5 and 9 requests for emergency relief is held in abeyance. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-1812MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MITCHELL WINE. (zeg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-1813RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, (See Docket Entry 12 to view document) filed by MITCHELL WINE. (zeg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar