Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2021cv01179
Date Filed2021-12-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted three FOIA requests to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning v-safe. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCenters for Disease Control and Prevention
DefendantHealth and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-281COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15567535), filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 14, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2021-12-282REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/5/2022) (lt). (Entered: 12/28/2021)
2021-12-28Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2021-12-28If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-043Summons Issued as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Health and Human Services. (dl) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-044Pro Hac Vice Letters sent to Elizabeth A. Brehm and Ursula Smith. (dl) (Entered: 01/04/2022)
2022-01-055REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informed Consent Action Network. (Amended Summons Request for CDC) (Siri, Aaron) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/5/2022) (lt). (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-05Notice of Correction: re 2 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. These filings include a fillable form. Fillable Forms must be flattened to permanently affix any signatures, or other items added to the document to include the case style, party names, dates, etc. This step should be performed prior to filing your documents through CM/ECF. Instructions are on the Court's website on the CM/ECF page under Training, "Printing to PDF." The Clerk's Office has flattened this form. No further action required. Please take note for future filing purposes (lt) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-056Summons Reissued as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. (lt) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar