Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00001
Date Filed2022-01-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration for records concerning onboarding documentation for a single political appointee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Defendant2255
NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-01-011COMPLAINT against NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8956392) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/01/2022)
2022-01-07Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-072SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znm) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-073STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 7, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar