Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJames Thomas Flocker v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2010cv06753
Date Filed2010-09-10
Date Closed2013-05-10
JudgeJudge John A. Kronstadt
PlaintiffJames Thomas Flocker
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [61]
FOIA Project Annotation: The court granted summary judgment to the FBI.
Issues: Housekeeping
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-101COMPLAINT against Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (et) (mg). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-1060 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation. (et) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-102EXHIBIT Filed as to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2010: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3) (mg). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-103CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (et) (mg). (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-104NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-145STANDING ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank (se) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
2010-10-156PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 9/15/2010, answer due 11/14/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Jenoveva Ortega, Legal Assistant. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2010-10-197MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for December 13, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report, ADR Pilot Program Questionnaire, and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection Form ADR-1/ADR-12 on or before November 29, 2010. (kbr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
2010-11-178FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Federal Bureau of Investigation answer now due 12/20/2010, filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
2010-11-299STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 12/13/10 to 03/21/11 filed by defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2010-11-3010ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank that Defendant shall answer, plead orotherwise respond to the Complaint in this action on or before 2/18/2010 8 . FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/13/2010 at 8:30 AM., is CONTINUED to 3/21/2011 at 8:30 AM 9 . Counsel are further directed to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report, ADR Pilot Program Questionnaire, and a Notice of Settlement Procedure Selection Form ADR-1/ADR-12 on or before 4/11/2011. (jp) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
2011-02-1811ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
2011-02-2812NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 11 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kbr) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
2011-03-1113JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 0 days, filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
2011-03-1114NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1); parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
2011-03-2115ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: Granted the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp1) to Appear Before Magistrate Judge Olguin for settlement proceedings. (kbr) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
2011-03-2116MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/15/2011. Written response to Order to Show Cause re plaintiff's failure to to file Rule 26(f) Report and failure to appear at Scheduling Conference due by 4/18/2011. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/25/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. See document for further deadlines.Court Reporter: Rosalyn Adams. (se) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
2011-04-0117AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Eric S. Jacobson filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker (Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
2011-04-0418MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Olguin for settlement. (mr) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
2011-04-0619MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: COURT ORDER DISCHARGING OSC RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE A RULE 26(F) REPORT AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 16 . (kbr) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
2011-04-2120SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank (se) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
2011-05-1021ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#11-028) approved by Chief Judge Audrey B. Collins. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John A. Kronstadt, this case is transferred from Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank to the calendar of Judge John A Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-06753 JAK (FMOx). (rn) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
2011-05-2522INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A Kronstadt. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt. (See Order for Details). (rp) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
2011-06-0623ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt: Set hearings( Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2011 01:30 PM before Judge John A Kronstadt.), Set deadlines( Amended Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/11/2011.) (rne) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
2011-06-2424MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, advances the time of the Scheduling Conference, currently scheduled for 7/18/2011, from 1:30 p.m. to 10:30 a.m. (vdr) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
2011-07-1125SUPPLEMENT to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 13 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
2011-07-1126Joint STIPULATION to Continue The Scheduling Conference from July 18, 2011 to September 12, 2011 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
2011-07-1227ORDER CONTINUING THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt, re Stipulation 26 . The Scheduling Conference is continued to 9/12/2011 at 10:30 AM. (vdr) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
2011-09-1228MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A Kronstadt. The Court confers with counsel regarding the parties' joint report and sets the following deadlines: September 27, 2011: Last day to file Defendant's motion for summary judgment; October 27, 2011: Last day to file Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; November 10, 2011: Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; November 22, 2011: Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion for summary judgment; and December 5, 2011 at 1:30 p.m.: Hearing on both motions for summary judgment. Counsel shall organize the categories under the Freedom of Information Act in a manner which is clear and easy to interpret. If the parties contend that discovery is required to respond to the summary judgment motion, counsel shall follow the process under Rule 56 and identify the specific facts regarding what discovery is needed. If counsel are not able to resolve the matter, the Court will evaluate it in the context of the motions. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (lom) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
2011-09-2029STIPULATION to Continue The Summary Judgment Deadling from September 27, 2011 to October 25, 2011 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
2011-09-2230ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, re Stipulation 29 . Deadlines for the parties summary judgment motions are continued as follows: The last day to file defendants motion for summary judgment is continued from September 27, 2011 to October 25, 2011. The last day to file plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is continued from October 27, 2011 to November 22, 2011. Defendants reply to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is continued from November 10, 2011 to December 6, 2011. Plaintiffs reply to Defendants motion for summary judgment is continued from November 22, 2011 to December 20, 2011. The hearing on both motions for summary judgment is continued from December 5, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. to January 9, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. (ir) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
2011-10-2131STIPULATION to Continue To Further Continue The Summary Judgment Deadlines from October 25, 2011 to December 9, 2011 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
2011-10-2432ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 31 TO CONTINUE THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES by Judge John A Kronstadt. Last day to file defendant's motion for summary judgment is 12/9/2011; plaintiff's motion by 1/6/2012; defendant's reply by 1/20/2012; plaintiff's reply by 2/3/2012; hearing on motions for summary judgment will be held on 2/13/2012 at 8:30 AM. (vdr) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
2011-12-0933NOTICE OF FILING AND FILING OF DECLARATION OF DAVID M. HARDY, INDEX OF DOCUMENTS AND EXHIBITS A - DD AS PART OF DEFENDANT'S VAUGHN INDEX filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of David M. Hardy, # 2 Declaration Of David M. Hardy, # 3 Vaughn Index, # 4 Exhibits A-H, # 5 Exhibits I-Z, # 6 Exhibits AA-DD)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
2011-12-0934NOTICE OF FILING AND FILING OF REDACTED DOCUMENTS, IDENTIFIED IN THE INDEX ATTACHED TO THE DECLARATION OF DAVID M. HARDY AS PART OF DEFENDANT'S VAUGHN INDEX filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Flocker Release Redacted)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
2011-12-0935STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Time To File A Summary Judgment Motion By Five Days from December 9, 2011 to December 14, 2011 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
2011-12-1436ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO FILE A SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BY FIVE DATES by Judge John A Kronstadt: IT IS SO ORDERED that the time for defendant to file amotion for summary judgment is continued from December 9, 2011 to and including December 14, 2011. 35 (ake) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
2011-12-1437NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge John A Kronstadt. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law Re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Judgment)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
2011-12-1538NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint 37 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-1539ORDER by Clerk of Court Judge Kronstadt hears civil motions on Mondays at 8:30 a.m. The document is accepted as filed. The Court advances the time of this motion from 1:30 p.m. to 8:30 a.m RE: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint 37 (shb) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2012-01-0540First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Dates)(Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
2012-01-0641ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment 40 . IT IS SO ORDERED that the deadlines for the parties summary judgment motions are continued as follows: The last day to file Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is continue from January 6, 2012 to March 6, 2012; Defendants reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is continued from January 20, 2012 to March 20, 2012. Plaintiffs reply to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is continued from February 3, 2012 to April l6, 2012. The hearing on both Motion for Summary Judgment is continued from February 13, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. to April 23, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. (shb) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
2012-02-2942Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation to Continue Plaintiff's Time to File a Summary Judgment Motion by Forty Days)(Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
2012-03-0243ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, re GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 42 : The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: Motions set for hearing on 7/9/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A Kronstadt. (rne) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
2012-04-2444Second EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to File Motion)(Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
2012-04-3045ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, re granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 42 . Trial Setting Conference set for 5/21/2012 01:30 PM. The hearing on both Motion for Summary Judgment is continued from July 9, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. to July 30, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. (rne) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
2012-05-18(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MAY 21, 2012 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE by Judge John A Kronstadt: In view of the filing of the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (DKT 37) and the scheduled filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on May 24, 2012, the Court continues the Trial Setting Conference from May 21, 2012 to June 11, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. On or before June 7, 2012, counsel are to contact the Court's Clerk to advise whether, based on their review of the cross-motions, either party anticipates the need for a trial in this matter as opposed to a determination of the FOIA issues through the cross-motions for summary judgment. If both counsel agree that there will not be a trial, the June 7, 2012 trial setting conference will be taken off calendar; if they do not, that conference will proceed.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/18/2012)
2012-05-2346NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A Kronstadt. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration Declaration of James Thomas Flocker, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Jan David Karowsky, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Eric S Jacobson, # 5 Memorandum Separate Statement of Genuine Issues of Fact and Law, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 4 to Motion, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 5 - 9 to Motion, # 8 Exhibit Exhibits 10-15 to Motion, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 16-20 to Motion, # 10 Exhibit Exhibits 21-25 to Motion, # 11 Exhibit Exhibits 26 -30 to Motion, # 12 Exhibit Exhibits 31- 35 to Motion, # 13 Exhibit Exhibits 36-40 to Motion, # 14 Exhibit Exhibits 41-45 to Motion, # 15 Exhibit Exhibits 46-52 to Motion, # 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
2012-05-2347MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint 37 Noticed by Defendant FBI filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
2012-06-07(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING JUNE 11, 2012 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John A Kronstadt: Pursuant to the Court's May 18, 2012 Order, defense counsel informed the Court's Clerk that she had conferred with Plaintiff's counsel and it was determined that the trial setting conference would not be necessary; that both counsel believed the matter would be resolved through the cross motions for summary judgment, currently on calendar for July 30, 2012. Therefore, the Court takes the June 11, 2012 trial setting conference off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/07/2012)
2012-06-2648STIPULATION to Continue THE DEADLINES FOR REPLY BRIEFS RE THE PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE HEARING DATE filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof Of Service)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
2012-06-2749ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, re Granting Stipulation to Continue Deadlines and Hearing Date on Motions for Summary Judgment 48 . Motions set for hearing on 9/17/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A Kronstadt. (rne) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
2012-07-2650REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Complaint 37 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
2012-07-2751PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation, re Reply (Motion related) 50 served on 7/27/2012. (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
2012-08-3152REPLY Reply in Support of Motion MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief 46 filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of James Thomas Flocker in Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
2012-09-1353(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. 37) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT. 46) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the motions from September 17, 2012 to October 22, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. 37 46 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/13/2012)
2012-10-2254MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT.37); PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(DKT.46) Motion Hearing held before Judge John A Kronstadt:The Court will take the matter under submission and will issue a written ruling.Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
2012-11-0555Joint STIPULATION to Continue THE DEADLINES FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE BRADY ISSUES from 11/05/2012 to 11/08/2012 filed by DEFENDANT Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
2012-11-0656ORDER by Judge John A Kronstadt, re granting Stipulation to Continue 55 . (rne) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
2012-11-0857SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief 46 filed by Plaintiff James Thomas Flocker. (Jacobson, Eric) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
2012-11-0858SUPPLEMENT to Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,, 54 filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 DAVIDSON DECLARATION, # 2 EXHIBIT A, # 3 EXHIBIT B, # 4 EXHIBIT C, # 5 EXHIBIT D, # 6 EXHIBIT E, # 7 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
2013-04-1859MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 37 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 46 : For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Defendants Motion and DENIES the Plaintiff's Motion. Defendant shall file a proposed judgment within 10 days of the issuance of this Order. Plaintiff shall file any objections to the proposed judgment within 7 days of Defendants filing IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ir) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-2960NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, 59 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,, 54 (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT, # 2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
2013-05-1061JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (rne) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar