Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Small Business League v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2010cv04138
Date Filed2010-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffAmerican Small Business League
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-151COMPLAINT /issued summons against United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611050611.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-152ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-15CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar