Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCRUMMEY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv01560
Date Filed2010-09-15
Date Closed2011-06-30
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffBRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
AppealD.C. Circuit 11-5231
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [35]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-151COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616032788) filed by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-15SUMMONS Not Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (td, ) . (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-15SUMMONS (3) Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
2010-09-172ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on September 17, 2010. (SM) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-12-063Rule 4(m) ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 6, 2010. (lcckk3) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
2010-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Cause process of service or status report by 1/13/2011. (dot) (Entered: 12/18/2010)
2010-12-224NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Anne Cotter on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
2010-12-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 12/10/2010, answer due 1/9/2011 for U.S. Attorney. (td, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
2011-01-037RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/10/2010., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 12/13/2010. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
2011-01-046First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
2011-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including February 8, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Set/Reset Deadline: Answer due by 2/8/2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 6, 2010. (SM) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-02-038MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
2011-02-03MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including February 18, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Set/Reset Deadline: Answer due by 2/18/2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 3, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
2011-02-189MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration with Exhibits A-N, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
2011-02-2210FOX/NEAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 22, 2011.(lcckk3) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-03-1511Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1-10)(td, ) Modified on 3/17/2011 to add "Certain Pages Were Received Illegible" (td, ). (Entered: 03/16/2011)
2011-03-2312MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
2011-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's (Opposed) Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including March 29, 2011, to file its reply. Set/Reset Deadline: Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 3/29/2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 23, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
2011-03-2913REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cotter, Christina) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
2011-04-0814MOTION for Leave to File a surreply by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Surreply)(td, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
2011-04-2515NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Gabriel R. Martinez on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Christina Cotter (Martinez, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
2011-04-2516REPLY Opposition to Sur-Reply re 14 MOTION for Leave to File filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Gabriel) Modified to add link on 4/26/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
2011-05-0517STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 5/31/2011.....First MOTION for Judicial Notice by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) Modified on 6/1/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
2011-05-1218Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
2011-05-2319Second MOTION for Judicial Notice by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
2011-05-2320MOTION to Strike 17 MOTION for Judicial Notice by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
2011-05-3121ORDER. Crummey's 20 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Motion for Judicial Notice is GRANTED; the Clerk of the Court shall STRIKE Crummey's 17 First Motion for Judicial Notice. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to Crummey at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 31, 2011. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
2011-06-0322Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Judicial Notice (Second) filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
2011-06-2725STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 7/1/2011.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY. (td, ) Modified on 7/5/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
2011-06-3023ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the SSA's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED. Crummey's 14 Motion to File a Surreply is DENIED. Crummey's 19 Second Motion for Judicial Notice is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; specifically, the motion is GRANTED insofar as Crummey asks this Court to take into account the materials and authorities cited in his motion, and the motion is DENIED to the extent Crummey seeks to supplement his arguments in opposition to the SSA's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order and the accompanying Memorandum Opinion to Crummey at his address of record: 5906 Bermuda Dunes, Houston, TX 77069. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 30, 2011. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
2011-06-3024MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 30, 2011. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
2011-07-0126ORDER. For the reasons set forth herein, the Clerk of the Court shall STRIKE Crummey's 25 Reply from the record; and the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum Order to Crummey at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 1, 2011. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
2011-08-2927NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 23 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616041831. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (dr) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
2011-08-3128Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 27 Notice of Appeal,. (dr) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
2011-09-13USCA Case Number 11-5231 for 27 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRENT EDWARD CRUMMEY. (kb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar